HI HB564 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-25 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-25 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for programs, ceremonies, and activities commemorating the 50TH Anniversary of the Vietnam War.
Title
Vietnam War; 50th Anniversary ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-25 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1005) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Galuteria, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran. |
2015-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-15 1:45PM in conference room 229. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Referred to PSM, WAM. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 60). |
2015-03-06 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-03-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 723), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-02-25 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-25-15 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2015-02-18 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Pouha excused (1). |
2015-02-18 | House | Reported from VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 325), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2015-02-09 | House | The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Ito, Tokioka, Brower, Choy, Kawakami, Kong, Ohno, Onishi, Tsuji, Woodson, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cachola, Matsumoto. |
2015-02-09 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2015-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by VMI on Monday, 02-09-15 9:05AM in House conference room 312. |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to VMI, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2015-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB669 (Same As) 2015-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=564&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/HB564_.HTM |