HI HB556 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-1)
Status: Passed on July 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Act 141, 06/26/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1243).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-1)
Status: Passed on July 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Act 141, 06/26/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1243).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of business, economic development, and tourism to adopt minimum appliance efficiency standards for certain products sold or installed in the State that are substantially equivalent to existing appliance efficiency standards established in California and by the federal government. (HB556 CD1)
Title
Relating To Energy Efficiency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-01 | Senate | Act 141, 06/26/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1243). |
2019-07-01 | House | Act 141, on 06/26/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1243). |
2019-05-01 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883). |
2019-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968). |
2019-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 47). |
2019-04-25 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19. |
2019-04-25 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 47) as amended in (CD 1). |
2019-04-25 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Baker, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-25 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, McKelvey, Takumi, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-19 4:30PM in conference room 224. |
2019-04-23 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-24-19 4:30PM in conference room 224. |
2019-04-22 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-23-19 4:30PM in conference room 224. |
2019-04-22 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 948). |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Wakai Chair; Baker, Taniguchi Co-Chairs; Fevella. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 814). |
2019-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Lowen, McKelvey, Takumi Co-Chairs; Thielen. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804). |
2019-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2019-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 756) in amended form (SD 2). |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-19. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1863) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2019-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Nishihara, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) L. Thielen, Fevella. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH deferred the measure until 03-29-19 10:00AM in conference room 229. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH will hold a public decision making on 03-28-19 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPH. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Reported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1385) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPH. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, J.Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Inouye. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-19 2:45PM in conference room 414. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 03-11-19 2:45PM in conference room 414. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 03-11-19 2:45PM in conference room 414. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred to EET, CPH. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 57). |
2019-02-28 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kong, Okimoto voting no (2) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-02-28 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 876), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-20 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Belatti, Cachola, Har, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Kong, Onishi; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Mizuno. |
2019-02-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-20-19 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2019-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Nakamura excused (2). |
2019-02-14 | House | Reported from EEP/EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 396) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2019-02-07 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kitagawa, Eli, Johanson, Quinlan, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama. |
2019-02-07 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Wildberger, Tarnas, Todd, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Har; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Thielen. |
2019-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP/EDB on Thursday, 02-07-19 8:40AM in House conference room 325. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to EEP/EDB, CPC, referral sheet 4 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |