HI HB555 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that any undergraduate degree-granting program that graduates less than ten graduates per year be abolished. Provides an exception for undergraduate programs that are self-sustaining. Authorizes the board of regents to extend the three-year time period to six years.
Title
University of Hawaii; Budget Crisis; Minimum Graduates
Sponsors
Rep. Isaac Choy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-02-05 | House | The committee(s) on HED recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2015-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HED on Thursday, 02-05-15 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2015-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=555&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HB555_.HTM |