HI HB554 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates tax credits for proposed projects to be located in areas that are location efficient. Establishes procedures for the Hawaii housing finance and development corporation to determine whether proposed projects meet certain requirements necessary to qualify for the tax credit. Requires the Hawaii housing finance and development corporation to report annually to the legislature. Applies to tax years beginning after December 31, 2012. Repeals on January 1, 2017.
Title
Economic Development; Hawaii Housing Finance and Development Corporation; Location Efficiency Tax Credits
Sponsors
Rep. Sharon Har [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Rep. Marcus Oshiro [D] | Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
Rep. Clift Tsuji [D] | Rep. Gene Ward [R] | Rep. Mark Hashem [D] | Rep. Gregg Takayama [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2013-01-22 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=554&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/HB554_.HTM |