HI HB552 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-04 - Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Takumi excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes clean ground transportation goals for state agencies on a staggered basis until achieving a one hundred per cent light-duty motor vehicle clean fleet by 12/31/2035. Requires all agencies purchasing or leasing medium- and heavy-duty motor vehicles to seek vehicles that reduce dependence on petroleum-based fuels that meet the needs of the agency, where feasible and cost-effective. Requires state and county agencies to purchase building materials for the project that reduce the carbon footprint of the project whenever feasible and costeffective. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Environment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-25 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-04HousePassed Third Reading with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Takumi excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2021-03-04HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 728), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2021-02-25HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2021-02-23HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-25-21 11:00AM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
2021-02-19HouseReport adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) McDermott, Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3).
2021-02-19HouseReported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 510), recommending referral to FIN.
2021-02-16HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Kong, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem.
2021-02-12HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 02-16-21 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
2021-02-12HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Hashimoto excused (3).
2021-02-12HouseReported from EEP/TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 246) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
2021-02-11HouseThe committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Ilagan, DeCoite, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, Nakamura, Takumi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2021-02-11HouseThe committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Marten, Hashem, Matayoshi, Perruso, Todd, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka.
2021-02-08HouseBill scheduled to be heard by EEP/TRN on Thursday, 02-11-21 11:00AM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
2021-01-27HouseReferred to EEP/TRN, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
2021-01-25HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2021-01-22HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB500 (Same As) 2021-01-27 - Referred to GVO/EET, WAM.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback