HI HB549 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-12 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Transfers the oversight and regulation of measurement standards in the State from the department of agriculture to the department of commerce and consumer affairs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Measurement Standards.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - House - House Agriculture: Passed, Unamended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-12HouseThe committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2021-02-10HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Friday, 02-12-21 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
2021-02-09HousePassed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2021-02-09HouseReported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 70), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
2021-02-05HouseThe committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashem, Perruso, Lowen, Marten, Matayoshi, Todd, Tokioka, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-02-03HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-05-21 10:00AM in conference room Via Videoconference.
2021-02-03HouseThe committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until Friday, 02-05-21.
2021-01-29HouseBill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 02-03-21 10:00AM in House conference room Via Videoconference.
2021-01-27HouseReferred to AGR, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
2021-01-25HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2021-01-22HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB944 (Same As) 2021-01-29 - Referred to AEN, CPN.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback