HI HB549 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB549
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Transfers the oversight and regulation of measurement standards in the State from the department of agriculture to the department of commerce and consumer affairs.
Title
Relating To Measurement Standards.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - House - House Agriculture: Passed, Unamended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-02-12 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2021-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Friday, 02-12-21 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-09 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2021-02-09 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 70), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2021-02-05 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashem, Perruso, Lowen, Marten, Matayoshi, Todd, Tokioka, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-05-21 10:00AM in conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-03 | House | The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until Friday, 02-05-21. |
2021-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 02-03-21 10:00AM in House conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to AGR, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB944 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
HB549 (Carry Over) 2021-02-12 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HB549 (Carry Over) 2021-02-12 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.