HI HB549 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Higher Education and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Higher Education and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a loan repayment program for attorneys who practice in an area of law related to public service. Makes an appropriation. (HB549 HD1)
Title
Attorneys; Public Service; Loan Repayment; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
Rep. Isaac Choy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Referred to HEA, WAM. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 58). |
2015-03-06 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-03-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 683), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-03-03 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2015-02-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 03-03-15 1:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2015-02-20 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Ito excused (1). |
2015-02-20 | House | Reported from HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 523) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2015-02-12 | House | The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Choy, Ichiyama, Ing, Ito, Kong, LoPresti, Ohno, Takumi, Tsuji, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Say, Tupola. |
2015-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HED on Thursday, 02-12-15 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2015-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB635 (Same As) 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.