HI HB548 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Allocates funds from TAT revenue directly to the state parks special fund, na ala hele statewide trail and access program, and beach restoration special fund, rather than through the special land and development fund, to improve certain state resources and services. Requires DLNR to submit to HTA an annual list of proposed projects in relation to the HTA Strategic Plan. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Transient Accommodations Tax.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-22SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2019-03-22SenateReported from EET/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1488) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2019-03-18SenateThe committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Fevella.
2019-03-18SenateThe committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, Inouye, J.Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2019-03-14SenateThe committee(s) on EET/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-19 3:20PM in conference room 414.
2019-03-07SenateReferred to EET/WTL, WAM.
2019-03-07SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-07SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 391).
2019-03-05HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-03-01HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-19.
2019-03-01HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1237) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-20HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Gates, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Hashimoto, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, McDermott.
2019-02-15HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-20-19 4:00PM in House conference room 308.
2019-02-15HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Matsumoto, McDermott voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
2019-02-15HouseReported from TIA/WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 512) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2019-02-12HouseThe committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Tarnas, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Thielen; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Lowen.
2019-02-12HouseThe committees on TIA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Onishi, Holt, Cachola, Perruso, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) DeCoite; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Creagan.
2019-02-06HouseBill scheduled to be heard by TIA/WLH on Tuesday, 02-12-19 9:30AM in House conference room Auditorium.
2019-01-22HouseReferred to TIA/WLH, FIN, referral sheet 4
2019-01-22HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-18HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB836 (Same As) 2019-02-08 - The committee on WTL deferred the measure.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback