HI HB547 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB547
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-27 - Referred to WAL, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-27 - Referred to WAL, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes within the department of land and natural resources a Makua Valley task force to prepare for the transition of the management of the Makua military reservation from the United States Army upon the expiration of the Army's lease for the land. Requires a report to the legislature.
Title
Relating To Federal Lands.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to WAL, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB547 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to WAL, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
SB902 (Same As) 2021-01-29 - Referred to PSM/WTL, WAM.
SB902 (Same As) 2021-01-29 - Referred to PSM/WTL, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=547&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/HB547_.HTM |