HI HB546 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Higher Education and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Higher Education and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires UH to provide nonsupervisory employees in blue collar positions with the same educational benefits provided to faculty. (HB546 HD1)
Title
University of Hawaii; Educational Benefits
Sponsors
Rep. Isaac Choy [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] | Rep. Matthew Lopresti [D] |
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to HEA/JDL, WAM. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 205). |
2015-03-10 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-03-06 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-10-15. |
2015-03-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 839) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-02-26 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Kobayashi; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2015-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-26-15 3:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2015-02-20 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Ito excused (1). |
2015-02-20 | House | Reported from HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 420), recommending referral to FIN. |
2015-02-12 | House | The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Choy, Ichiyama, Ing, Ito, Kong, LoPresti, Ohno, Takumi, Tsuji, Matsumoto, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Say. |
2015-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HED on Thursday, 02-12-15 2:03PM in House conference room 309. |
2015-02-10 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on HED with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2015-02-10 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 88), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HED. |
2015-02-09 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2015-02-06 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Keohokalole, Har, Johanson, LoPresti, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Takumi, Yamashita, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Ichiyama. |
2015-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Friday, 02-06-15 9:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to LAB, HED, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2015-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |