HI HB544 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB544
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-25 - The committee(s) on WLH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-25 - The committee(s) on WLH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that the State or a county that repairs or maintains a street of which the ownership or jurisdiction is in dispute between the State and the county, shall be immune from liability for personal injuries or property damage arising out of the repair or maintenance of that street. Deems that maintenance of a street shall not confer ownership or jurisdiction over such street, if the ownership or jurisdiction over the street is in dispute between the State and the county.
Title
Relating To Liability.
Sponsors
Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] | Rep. Lynn Decoite [D] | Sen. Troy Hashimoto [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] |
Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Rep. Chris Todd [D] | Rep. Tina Wildberger [D] | Rep. Justin Woodson [D] |
Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-25 | House | The committee(s) on WLH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2019-01-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WLH on Friday, 01-25-19 10:35AM in House conference room 423. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to WLH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB544 (Carry Over) 2019-01-25 - The committee(s) on WLH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
SB581 (Same As) 2019-01-24 - Referred to TRS/PSM, JDC/WAM.
SB581 (Same As) 2019-01-24 - Referred to TRS/PSM, JDC/WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=544&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB544_.HTM |