HI HB532 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB532
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-09 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ito excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-09 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ito excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates moneys to the office of elections for "I voted" stickers to be distributed at polling places. (HB532 HD1)
Title
Relating To Voting.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-09 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ito excused (1). |
2017-02-09 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 129) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2017-02-01 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Johanson, Morikawa, Nakashima, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee, Oshiro, McDermott. |
2017-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 02-01-17 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2017-01-23 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB532 (Carry Over) 2017-02-09 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ito excused (1).