HI HB518 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB518
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Re-referred to TIA, FIN, referral sheet 13
Pending: House Tourism & International Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Re-referred to TIA, FIN, referral sheet 13
Pending: House Tourism & International Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the distribution of transient accommodations tax revenues by changing the amount distributed to the counties from a fixed sum to a percentage of the revenues collected.
Title
Relating To Transient Accommodations Tax.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Re-referred to TIA, FIN, referral sheet 13 |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB518 (Carry Over) 2019-02-05 - Re-referred to TIA, FIN, referral sheet 13
SB405 (Same As) 2019-01-24 - Referred to EET/PSM, WAM.
SB405 (Same As) 2019-01-24 - Referred to EET/PSM, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=518&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB518_.HTM |