HI HB518 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB518
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes an income tax credit for farmers who purchase water at higher rates from county water boards rather than at lower state irrigation system rates. Establishes the amount of the credit as the difference between the amount charged by state irrigation systems and the amount the state irrigation systems should charge in order to sustain operations. Deducts the cost of the tax credit from the irrigation system revolving fund. Applies to taxable years beginning after 12/31/2017.
Title
Relating To Irrigation.
Sponsors
Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] | Rep. Richard Creagan [D] | Rep. Gregg Takayama [D] | Rep. Isaac Choy [D] |
Rep. Lynn Decoite [D] | Rep. Cedric Gates [D] | Rep. Kaniela Ing [D] | Rep. Matthew Lopresti [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-08 | House | The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2017-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 02-08-17 8:30AM in House conference room 312. |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2017-01-23 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB518 (Carry Over) 2017-02-08 - The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=518&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/HB518_.HTM |