HI HB505 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB505
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-10 - The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-10 - The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals provision requiring counties to adopt ordinances regulating agricultural tourism as a precondition for allowing agricultural tourism activities in an agricultural district. Allows agricultural commerce, rather than agricultural tourism, in an agricultural district.
Title
Relating To Agricultural Commerce.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-10 | House | The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2017-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Friday, 02-10-17 8:30AM in House conference room 312. |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2017-01-23 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB505 (Carry Over) 2017-02-10 - The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=505&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/HB505_.HTM |