HI HB505 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-18 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Pouha excused (1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes an Agricultural Development and Food Security Program. Establishes state planning objectives to increase demand and access to locally grown foods. Makes appropriations. (HB505 HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Agriculture; Food Security; Appropriations ($)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-02-18HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Pouha excused (1).
2015-02-18HouseReported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 348) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2015-02-12HouseThe committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Onishi, Brower, Cachola, Choy, Ito, Kawakami, Kong, Ohno, Tokioka, Woodson, Matsumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2015-02-11HouseBroadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
2015-02-09HouseBill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Thursday, 02-12-15 8:30AM in House conference room 312.
2015-01-28HouseReferred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 2
2015-01-26HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2015-01-23HousePending introduction.

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback