HI HB503 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB503
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows boards to use interactive conference technology to remotely conduct public meetings under the sunshine law in conjunction with in-person meetings, even when no emergency has been declared by government authorities. Authorizes boards to exclude the public from nonpublic locations, such as homes, where board members are physically present when remote board meetings are held by interactive conference technology. Establishes requirements for the conduct of remote meetings. Establishes a new notice requirement to provide the board's contact information for the submission of written testimony by electronic or postal mail. Amends existing option to hold in-person meetings at multiple public meeting sites connected by interactive conference technology to require termination of meeting only if audio communication is lost and cannot be reestablished within an hour and the board had not provided reasonable notice of how the meeting would be continued. Allows for additional courtesy sites open to the public for remote and in-person meetings held by interactive conference technology. Allows for contact tracing and social distancing during states of emergency caused by contagious diseases. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Board Meetings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-02 - House - House Pandemic & Disaster Preparedness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-02-12 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Hashimoto excused (3). |
2021-02-12 | House | Reported from PDP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 210) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2021-02-02 | House | The committees on PDP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Eli, Cullen, McKelvey, Mizuno, Wildberger, Woodson, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2021-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by PDP on Tuesday, 02-02-21 9:45AM in House conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to PDP, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB661 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
HB503 (Carry Over) 2021-02-12 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Hashimoto excused (3).
HB503 (Carry Over) 2021-02-12 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Hashimoto excused (3).