HI HB502 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB502
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-08 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-08 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a two-year infant and toddler child care contracted slots pilot program to develop and implement procedures to subsidize child care slots in licensed infant and toddler child care settings. Requires reports to the legislature.
Title
Relating To Child Care.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-08 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2023-02-08 | House | Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 199) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2023-02-02 | House | The committee on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Belatti, Ilagan, Kobayashi, Takenouchi, Nishimoto, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Amato. |
2023-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Thursday, 02-02-23 9:00AM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-01-27 | House | Referred to HUS, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2023-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB502 (Carry Over) 2023-02-08 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
SB311 (Same As) 2023-01-25 - Referred to HHS, WAM.
SB311 (Same As) 2023-01-25 - Referred to HHS, WAM.
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Department of Human Services
Infant and Toddlers Child Care Contracted Slots Pilot Program
Report
Department of Human Services
Infant and Toddlers Child Care Contracted Slots Pilot Program
Report