HI HB5 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB5
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the minimum wage to $11.50 per hour in 2020, $13.00 per hour in 2021, and $14.60 per hour in 2022.
Title
Relating To Minimum Wage.
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Holt [D] | Rep. Cedric Gates [D] | Sen. Troy Hashimoto [D] | Rep. Sean Quinlan [D] |
Rep. Chris Todd [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2019-01-17 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-16 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB5 (Carry Over) 2019-01-22 - Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 2
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=5&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB5_.HTM |