HI HB491 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-1)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-27 - Referred to HHH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Allows the executive office of aging to relax the thirty-hour employment requirement for qualified caregivers under the Kupuna Caregivers Program during a state-declared state of emergency. Adds the option of kupuna caregiver-directed services to the kupuna caregivers program. Includes assisting the care recipient and caregiver with the enrollment process as the duty of a coach. Allows funds under the Kupuna Caregivers Program to be issued to the care recipient's financial management service provider.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Services For Kupuna.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-27HouseReferred to HHH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
2021-01-25HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2021-01-22HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB838 (Same As) 2021-03-04 - One Day Notice 03-05-21.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback