HI HB490 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-1)
Status: Passed on July 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - Act 147, on 07/01/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1249).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-1)
Status: Passed on July 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - Act 147, on 07/01/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1249).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Lowers the age at which enhanced penalties apply for crimes against seniors from sixty-two years of age to sixty years of age. Makes commission of certain criminal offenses against a senior's person or property applicable if the perpetrator knows or reasonably should know the senior victim's age. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Crimes Against Seniors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-19 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-02 | House | Act 147, on 07/01/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1249). |
2021-07-02 | Senate | Act 147, 07/01/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1249). |
2021-04-28 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 635). |
2021-04-27 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2021-04-27 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2021-04-23 | House | Deferred one day 04-27-21. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Received notice of discharge of all conferees (Hse. Com. No. 628). |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 623). |
2021-04-22 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 03-30-21. |
2021-04-22 | House | House Conferee(s) discharged. |
2021-04-21 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-22-21 2:45PM in conference room CR 329. |
2021-04-19 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-21-21 3:00PM in conference room CR 329. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 560). |
2021-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Yamane, Nakashima Co-Chairs; Ward. |
2021-04-15 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 791). |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Rhoads Chair; Kim, Fevella. |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 320). |
2021-03-30 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2021-03-29 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 463) in amended form (SD 1). |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio, San Buenaventura . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-29-21. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1212) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keohokalole, Gabbard. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-21 9:30AM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 224). |
2021-03-09 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-03-05 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-09-21. |
2021-03-05 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 900) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2021-02-23 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Todd, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi, Takumi; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2021-02-19 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 02-23-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-18 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates excused (1). |
2021-02-18 | House | Reported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 450) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2021-02-11 | House | The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Gates, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti. |
2021-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHH on Thursday, 02-11-21 9:30AM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to HHH, JHA, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB837 (Same As) 2021-01-29 - Referred to JDC.