HI HB484 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB484
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-09 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ito excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-09 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ito excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts amounts received from servicing and maintenance of helicopters and the construction of maintenance facilities at which helicopters are serviced from the general excise tax. (HB484 HD1)
Title
Relating To Taxation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-09 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ito excused (1). |
2017-02-09 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 142) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2017-02-03 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Quinlan, Brower, Hashem; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Nakamura, San Buenaventura; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2017-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Friday, 02-03-17 10:30AM in House conference room 423. |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2017-01-23 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB484 (Carry Over) 2017-02-09 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ito excused (1).
SB769 (Same As) 2017-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
SB769 (Same As) 2017-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.