HI HB484 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-16 - Re-Referred to WTL/AGL/HWN, WAM.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-16 - Re-Referred to WTL/AGL/HWN, WAM.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Includes existing taro-growing systems, ancient wetland taro lands, and taro-growing structures as special agricultural lands to be protected from development. Effective July 1, 2050. (HB484 HD1)
Title
Agricultural Lands; Wetland Taro Lands Protection
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-16 | Senate | Re-Referred to WTL/AGL/HWN, WAM. |
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Referred to WTL/AGL/THA, WAM. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 224). |
2013-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Jordan, Oshiro, Tokioka, Tsuji, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Choy, Fale, Har, Say voting no (4) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 821), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-02-27 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Hashem, Ing, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cullen, Jordan, Kobayashi, Tokioka, Ward; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-02-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-27-13 11:30AM in House conference room 308. |
2013-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, Coffman, Hanohano, Har, Kawakami, Ward excused (6). |
2013-02-15 | House | Reported from AGR/WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 477) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2013-02-13 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Lowen, Hanohano, Fale, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Coffman, Cullen, Kawakami, C. Lee. |
2013-02-13 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Wooley, Onishi, Brower, Ohno, Tokioka, Tsuji, Cheape, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cachola, Choy, Takayama. |
2013-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-13-13 8:00AM in conference room 325. |
2013-02-04 | House | The committee(s) on AGR/WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2013-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR/WAL on Monday, 02-04-13 8:30AM in House conference room Auditorium. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to AGR/WAL, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2013-01-22 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |