HI HB482 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB482
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes medical cannabis dispensaries to distribute cannabis propagules and cuttings to individuals authorized to cultivate cannabis plants for medical use, subject to quantity limits and quality requirements.
Title
Relating To Cannabis For Medical Use.
Sponsors
Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] | Rep. Della au Belatti [D] | Rep. Cedric Gates [D] | Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] |
Rep. Gregg Takayama [D] | Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-02-05 | House | The committee(s) on HHH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2021-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHH on Friday, 02-05-21 8:30AM in House conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to HHH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB481 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
HB482 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - The committee(s) on HHH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HB482 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - The committee(s) on HHH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=482&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB482_.HTM |