HI HB482 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-05 - The committee(s) on HHH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes medical cannabis dispensaries to distribute cannabis propagules and cuttings to individuals authorized to cultivate cannabis plants for medical use, subject to quantity limits and quality requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Cannabis For Medical Use.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05HouseThe committee(s) on HHH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2021-02-02HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HHH on Friday, 02-05-21 8:30AM in House conference room Via Videoconference.
2021-01-27HouseReferred to HHH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
2021-01-25HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2021-01-22HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB481 (Same As) 2021-01-27 - Referred to HTH, JDC.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback