HI HB480 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB480
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 385).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 385).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes an appropriation to the Hawaii community college for the Hawaii community college and University of Hawaii at Hilo, in collaboration with the Department of Agriculture and the Agribusiness Development Corporation, to study agriculture and agricultural learning opportunities on the island of Hawaii. Requires the Hawaii community college to submit a report to the legislature. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Agriculture.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | Senate | Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 385). |
2018-03-14 | House | House Conferee(s) discharged. |
2018-01-17 | House | Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 1). |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Senate Conferee(s) discharged. |
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-04-28 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-28-17 at 4:30PM in Conference Room 329. |
2017-04-27 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-28-17 10:00AM in conference room 329. |
2017-04-26 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-27-17 1:00PM in conference room 329. |
2017-04-21 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-26-17 10:30AM in conference room 329. |
2017-04-20 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-21-17 1:00PM in conference room 329. |
2017-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 680). |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: K. Kahele Chair; Inouye Co-Chair; Dela Cruz, Kidani. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 586). |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 585). |
2017-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: McKelvey, DeCoite Co-Chairs; Matsumoto. |
2017-04-13 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2017-04-11 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 574) in amended form (SD 1). |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-11-17. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1530) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-17 9:35AM in conference room 211. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Reported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1123) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Kidani, Espero, Keith-Agaran; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi. |
2017-03-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-17 1:15PM in conference room 414. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to HRE, WAM. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 35). |
2017-03-02 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-03-02 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 759), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-02-22 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Quinlan, Yamashita, Tupola, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Choy. |
2017-02-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-22-17 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2017-02-17 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2). |
2017-02-17 | House | Reported from HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 486) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2017-02-14 | House | The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Hashem, Creagan, Har, Ing, Ohno, Onishi, Takumi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HED on Tuesday, 02-14-17 2:03PM in House conference room 309. |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2017-01-23 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1082 (Same As) 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
HB480 (Carry Over) 2017-04-28 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-28-17 at 4:30PM in Conference Room 329.
HB480 (Carry Over) 2017-04-28 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-28-17 at 4:30PM in Conference Room 329.
Subjects
Agricultural Study
Agriculture Programs
Appropriation ($)
Hawaii Community College
Island of Hawaii
University of Hawaii at Hilo
Agriculture Programs
Appropriation ($)
Hawaii Community College
Island of Hawaii
University of Hawaii at Hilo