HI HB478 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-30 - Act 139, 06/29/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1242).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-30 - Act 139, 06/29/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1242).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies the membership and qualifications for membership of the State Foundation on Culture and the Arts Commission. (CD1)
Title
Relating To The State Foundation On Culture And The Arts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-28 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-28 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-28 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-30 | Senate | Act 139, 06/29/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1242). |
2023-06-30 | House | Act 139, on 06/29/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1242). |
2023-05-03 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 900). |
2023-05-02 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 993). |
2023-05-02 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) Holt voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pierick voting no (1) and Representative(s) Quinlan excused (1). |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2023-04-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-23. |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 105). |
2023-04-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-02-23. |
2023-04-28 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 105) as amended in (CD 1). |
2023-04-28 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Kim, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-04-28 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Tam, Kila, Kapela, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Garrett. |
2023-04-27 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-28-23 10:31AM in conference room 329. |
2023-04-26 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-27-23 10:31AM in conference room 329. |
2023-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-26-23 10:45AM in conference room 329. |
2023-04-24 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-25-23 10:30AM in conference room 329. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 839). |
2023-04-21 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Tam, Kila Co-Chairs; Garrett, Kapela, Alcos. |
2023-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 914). |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Lee Chair; Kim Co-Chair; Awa. |
2023-04-14 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 800). |
2023-04-13 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2023-04-11 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 746) in amended form (SD 2). |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Keohokalole). Transmitted to House. |
2023-04-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-11-23. |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1866) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2023-04-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro. |
2023-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-05-23 10:00AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Reported from TCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1385) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2023-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TCA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, Elefante, Keohokalole, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Referred to TCA, WAM. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 54). |
2023-03-02 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pierick voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2023-03-02 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 866), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2023-02-22 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Kobayashi, Alcos. |
2023-02-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-22-23 2:30PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-02-07 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pierick voting no (1) and none excused (0). |
2023-02-07 | House | Reported from CAI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 144) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2023-02-01 | House | The committee on CAI recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Tam, Martinez, Garrett, Matayoshi, Sayama, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kapela. |
2023-01-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CAI on Wednesday, 02-01-23 10:00AM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-01-25 | House | Referred to CAI, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2023-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |