HI HB463 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB463
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 385).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 385).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows any satellite city hall in any county with a population of more than seven hundred thousand persons to issue Hawaii state identification cards. Requires a report to the legislature. Takes effect on 1/7/2059. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Hawaii State Identification Cards.
Sponsors
Rep. Gregg Takayama [D] | Rep. Lynn Decoite [D] | Rep. Sharon Har [D] | Rep. Aaron Johanson [D] |
Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] | Rep. Sam Kong [D] | Rep. Roy Takumi [D] | Rep. Cynthia Thielen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | Senate | Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 385). |
2018-03-14 | House | House Conferee(s) discharged. |
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 586). |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 585). |
2017-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Nishimoto, Cachola Co-Chairs; Takayama, McDermott. |
2017-04-17 | House | Re-referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 45 |
2017-04-13 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2017-04-11 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 571) in amended form (SD 1). |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-11-17. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Reported from JDL/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1520) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2017-03-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, K. Kahele, Shimabukuro. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL/WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-30-17 9:50AM in conference room 211. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDL/WAM. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Reported from PSM/TRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1115) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDL/WAM. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TRE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Harimoto, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, English. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Baker, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, Ihara. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Re-Referred to PSM/TRE, JDL/WAM. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM/TRE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-16-17 1:30PM in conference room 229. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to PSM/TRE, WAM. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 262). |
2017-03-07 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-03-02 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). |
2017-03-02 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 802) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2017-02-07 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Johanson, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima, Oshiro, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-07-17 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 2 |
2017-01-23 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB463 (Carry Over) 2017-04-17 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 586).