HI HB460 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB460
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-22 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-22 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits a county from accepting a discounted payment of a fine levied by the county planning and permitting department or agency. Requires the State Auditor to conduct an annual audit of the fines levied and collected by the counties. (HB460 HD1)
Title
Relating To The Counties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1381) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Fevella. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-19 1:20PM in conference room 229. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to PSM, WAM. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 380). |
2019-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Hashimoto, Nakamura, Okimoto, San Buenaventura voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-03-01 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Nakashima excused (2). |
2019-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1157) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2019-02-22 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Hashimoto, Nakamura; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Todd, McDermott. |
2019-02-20 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-22-19 12:35PM in conference room 308. |
2019-02-06 | House | The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2019-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-06-19 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB460 (Carry Over) 2019-03-22 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.