HI HB452 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on June 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-26 - Act 128, 6/24/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1231).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on June 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-26 - Act 128, 6/24/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1231).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Deems any person who provides false information regarding the details of voting to be guilty of election fraud. Makes conforming amendments to clarify that advertisements shall not contain false information about the time, date, place, or means of voting. (HB452 CD1)
Title
Election Fraud; Polling Misinformation; Advertisements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-26 | Senate | Act 128, 6/24/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1231). |
2014-06-26 | House | Act 128, on 6/24/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1231). |
2014-05-05 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 751). |
2014-04-30 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 720). |
2014-04-29 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ito excused (1). |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2014-04-24 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-29-14. |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 15-14). |
2014-04-24 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 4-29-14. |
2014-04-24 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 15-14) as amended in (CD 1). |
2014-04-21 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2014-04-21 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Brower, C. Lee, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2014-04-17 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday 04-21-14 1:30PM in conference room 325. |
2014-04-16 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-17-14 1:30PM in conference room 325. |
2014-04-14 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 673). |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 684). |
2014-04-14 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Rhoads Chair; Brower, C. Lee, Thielen Members. |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Hee Chair; Shimabukuro Co-Chair; Slom Member. |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 504). |
2014-04-04 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2014-04-03 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 485) in amended form (SD 1). |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Kidani). Transmitted to House. |
2014-04-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-03-14. |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3164) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2014-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Galuteria, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Solomon. |
2014-03-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-14 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Referred to JDL. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 10). |
2014-01-31 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Say excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-01-29 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takai excused (1). |
2014-01-29 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 25-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2014-01-16 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Creagan, Kawakami, C. Lee, Nakashima, Tsuji, Wooley, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Belatti, Brower, Ito. |
2014-01-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 01-16-14 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 3 |
2013-01-22 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |