HI HB446 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB446
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain individuals attempting to serve as child custody evaluators to complete a training course on domestic violence issues every 3 years. Requires the Family Court to approve training courses and publish approved courses on the Judiciary website.
Title
Relating To Child Custody.
Sponsors
Rep. May Mizuno [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-02-09 | House | The committee(s) on HUS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2023-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Thursday, 02-09-23 9:00AM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-01-25 | House | Referred to HUS, JHA, referral sheet 1 |
2023-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB446 (Carry Over) 2023-02-09 - The committee(s) on HUS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=446&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB446_.HTM |