HI HB445 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB445
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes general obligation bonds for capital improvements to the State's water reuse systems. (HB445 HD1)
Title
Relating To Capital Improvement Projects For Water Reuse.
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Rep. Sharon Har [D] |
Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] | Rep. Tina Wildberger [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-20 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 44). |
2019-02-28 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 858), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-20 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Gates, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Hashimoto, Nakamura, Todd. |
2019-02-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-20-19 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-02-08 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Nakamura, Thielen excused (3). |
2019-02-08 | House | Reported from WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 193) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-01-30 | House | The committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Har, Lowen, Tarnas, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Thielen. |
2019-01-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WLH on Wednesday, 01-30-19 9:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB445 (Carry Over) 2019-03-05 - Referred to WAM.