HI HB444 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts lessors from the rental motor vehicle surcharge tax when renting an electric vehicle for a period of two years. Effective July 1, 2011. (HB444 HD1)
Title
Rental Motor Vehicle Surcharge Tax; Electric Vehicles
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-02-07 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | |
2011-02-07 | (H) Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 42) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2011-02-01 | (H) The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Morita, Coffman, Chang, Chong, Ito, Nakashima, Riviere, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Har, Herkes; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll. | |
2011-01-28 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 02-01-11 8:00AM in House conference room 325. | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 1 | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (H) Pending introduction. |