HI HB432 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB432
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-22 - Referred to CPC, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-22 - Referred to CPC, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
On or before June 30, 2021, requires planned community associations to register with the real estate commission. Requires the real estate commission to administer and enforce planned community association laws. Establishes the planned community association trust fund for specific purposes related to planned community associations, including the use of mediation and arbitration of association related disputes.
Title
Relating To Planned Community Associations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to CPC, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB432 (Carry Over) 2019-01-22 - Referred to CPC, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 3
SB722 (Same As) 2019-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
SB722 (Same As) 2019-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
Subjects
Administration
Arbitration ($)
Enforcement
Mediation
Planned Community Association Education Trust Fund
Planned Community Associations
Real Estate Commission
Registration
Arbitration ($)
Enforcement
Mediation
Planned Community Association Education Trust Fund
Planned Community Associations
Real Estate Commission
Registration
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=432&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB432_.HTM |