HI HB429 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB429
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires individuals to complete a firearms skills assessment, safety course, and education course prior to being granted a license to carry a pistol or revolver.
Title
Relating To Firearms.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-01-25 | House | Referred to JHA, referral sheet 1 |
2023-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB979 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
HB429 (Carry Over) 2023-01-25 - Referred to JHA, referral sheet 1
HB429 (Carry Over) 2023-01-25 - Referred to JHA, referral sheet 1
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=429&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB429_.HTM |