HI HB424 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB424
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Public Safety, Veterans, & Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Public Safety, Veterans, & Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the Department of Public Safety from using for-profit prisons to house inmates by 2035.
Title
Relating To Corrections.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-02-01 | House | The committee(s) on PVM recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2019-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by PVM on Friday, 02-01-19 10:00AM in House conference room 430. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to PVM, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB424 (Carry Over) 2019-02-01 - The committee(s) on PVM recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=424&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB424_.HTM |