HI HB424 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-01 - The committee(s) on PVM recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Public Safety, Veterans, & Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits the Department of Public Safety from using for-profit prisons to house inmates by 2035.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Corrections.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-01HouseThe committee(s) on PVM recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2019-01-29HouseBill scheduled to be heard by PVM on Friday, 02-01-19 10:00AM in House conference room 430.
2019-01-22HouseReferred to PVM, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 3
2019-01-22HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-18HousePending introduction.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback