HI HB423 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires hospitals to provide information about emergency contraception to women who are sexually assaulted and to provide emergency contraception when requested. Provides for administrative penalties for noncompliance. (HB423 HD2)
Title
Sexual Assault; Emergency Contraception
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-02-19 | (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Aquino, Ching, Finnegan, Manahan, Pine, Yamane voting no and Representative(s) Takai, Takumi, Ward excused. | |
2009-02-18 | (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 472) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. | |
2009-02-17 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Karamatsu, Ito, Belatti, Cabanilla, Herkes, Luke, Mizuno, Morita, B. Oshiro, Tsuji, Wakai, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Souki; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, McKelvey. | |
2009-02-13 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred until 02-17-09. | |
2009-02-11 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 02-13-09 2:20PM in House conference room 325. | |
2009-02-11 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting no (0) and Takai excused (1). | |
2009-02-10 | (H) Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 183) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. | |
2009-02-03 | (H) The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Nishimoto, Belatti, Bertram, Brower, Carroll, Mizuno, Finnegan; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Shimabukuro. | |
2009-02-02 | (H) Re-referred to HLT, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6 | |
2009-01-30 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 02-03-09 8:30am in House conference room 329. | |
2009-01-26 | (H) Referred to HLT, JUD, referral sheet 2 | |
2009-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2009-01-23 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB604 (Same As) 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.