HI HB422 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Applies the solid waste disposal surcharge to waste that is deposited in landfills, incinerators, or waste-to-energy facilities, whether the waste is disposed of in-state or transferred out-of-state. Effective July 1, 2030. (HB422 HD2)
Title
Solid Waste; Disposal Surcharge
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Referred to ENE, WAM. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 102). | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 728) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2011-02-28 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Chong, Choy, Coffman, Cullen, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Riviere; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Marumoto; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee, Ward. | |
2011-02-25 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-28-11 10:30AM in House conference room 308. | |
2011-02-10 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | |
2011-02-10 | (H) Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 193) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2011-02-08 | (H) The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Morita, Coffman, Chang, Chong, Herkes, Nakashima, Riviere, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, Har, Ito. | |
2011-02-03 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-08-11 9:35AM in conference room 325. | |
2011-02-03 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred until 02-08-11 at 9:30AM. | |
2011-01-31 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-03-11 8:30AM in House conference room 325. | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 1 | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB725 (Same As) 2012-04-13 - (H) Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 747).