HI HB42 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB42
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-08 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Nakamura, Thielen excused (3).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-08 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Nakamura, Thielen excused (3).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a task force in the Department of Health's Behavioral Health Services Administration to study access and service gap issues in providing essential services to the State's intellectually and developmentally disabled individuals. (HB42 HD1)
Title
Relating To Health.
Sponsors
Rep. John Mizuno [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-08 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Nakamura, Thielen excused (3). |
2019-02-08 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 177) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2019-01-31 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, Say, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka. |
2019-01-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Thursday, 01-31-19 9:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2019-01-17 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-16 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB42 (Carry Over) 2019-02-08 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Nakamura, Thielen excused (3).
SB242 (Same As) 2019-05-01 - Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968).
SB242 (Same As) 2019-05-01 - Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968).