HI HB42 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-01-26 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-01-26 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the elections commission to conduct a performance evaluation of the chief election officer after each election and submit a written report regarding the evaluation to the legislature.
Title
Elections Commission; Evaluation of Chief Election Officer
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-26 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2015-01-22 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB622 (Same As) 2015-03-27 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Choy, Ing, Lowen, Luke, McKelvey, Pouha excused (6).
HB1414 (Same As) 2015-02-02 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
HB1414 (Same As) 2015-02-02 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=42&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/HB42_.HTM |