HI HB1414 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-02 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the elections commission to conduct a performance evaluation of the chief election officer after each election and submit a written report regarding the evaluation to the legislature.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elections Commission; Evaluation of Chief Election Officer

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-02-02HouseReferred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
2015-01-29HouseIntroduced and Passed First Reading

Same As/Similar To

SB622 (Same As) 2015-03-27 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Choy, Ing, Lowen, Luke, McKelvey, Pouha excused (6).
HB42 (Same As) 2015-01-26 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 1

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback