HI HB417 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB417
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits golf carts from operating at a speed greater than twenty-five miles per hour. Prohibits neighborhood electric vehicles and golf carts from being driven on highways with a posted speed limit greater than twenty-five miles, except for crossing an intersection at a highway with a posted speed limit greater than twenty-five miles. Restricts operation of neighborhood electric vehicles or golf carts to daylight hours unless the vehicle is equipped with headlights. Authorizes county police departments to confiscate neighborhood electric vehicles or golf carts at the time of violation.
Title
Relating To Golf Carts.
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Todd [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-01-25 | House | Referred to JHA, referral sheet 1 |
2023-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB417 (Carry Over) 2023-01-25 - Referred to JHA, referral sheet 1
SB1184 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
SB1184 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=417&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB417_.HTM |