HI HB413 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a state residential drug abuse program with an incommunity component to help inmates' reentry into the community upon their release from prison. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Public Safety; Prisons; Residential Drug Abuse Program Reentry
Sponsors
Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Faye Hanohano [D] | Rep. Marilyn Lee [D] | Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] |
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] | Rep. Joseph Souki [D] | Rep. Roy Takumi [D] | Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-03-27 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2009-03-27 | (S) Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1022) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2009-03-19 | (S) The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Bunda, Galuteria, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Gabbard, Hemmings. | |
2009-03-16 | (S) The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-09 1:30pm in conference room 229. | |
2009-03-12 | (S) Referred to PSM, WAM. | |
2009-03-12 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-03-12 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 113). | |
2009-03-10 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takai excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2009-03-06 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-10-2009. | |
2009-03-06 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 874) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2009-02-27 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Aquino, Awana, Brower, Choy, Coffman, Har, Keith-Agaran, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Sagum, Wooley, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Pine; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Tokioka, Ward. | |
2009-02-24 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-27-09 12:00pm in House conference room 308. | |
2009-02-19 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Takai, Takumi, Ward excused (3). | |
2009-02-18 | (H) Reported from PBS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 401), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2009-02-12 | (H) The committees on PBS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, Aquino, Awana, M. Lee, Nakashima, Rhoads, Saiki, Souki, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Keith-Agaran, Takumi, Pine. | |
2009-02-09 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by PBS on Thursday, 02-12-09 8:30AM in House conference room 309. | |
2009-01-26 | (H) Referred to PBS, FIN, referral sheet 2 | |
2009-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2009-01-23 | (H) Pending introduction. |