HI HB412 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB412
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Librarian's salary set by the Board of Education to no more than 90 percent of the Superintendent of Education's salary. (HB412 HD1)
Title
Relating To The Salary Of The State Librarian.
Sponsors
Rep. Justin Woodson [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Daniel Holt [D] | Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] |
Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Amy Perruso [D] | Rep. Lisa Kitagawa [D] | Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-12 - House - House Lower and Higher Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House Labor & Public Employment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House Labor & Public Employment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Nakamura excused (2). |
2019-02-14 | House | Reported from LAB/LHE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 388) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-02-12 | House | The committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Hashem, Perruso, DeCoite, Johanson, D. Kobayashi, Ohno, Quinlan, Tarnas, Tokioka, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2019-02-12 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Eli, Kitagawa, Quinlan, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, McKelvey. |
2019-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB/LHE on Tuesday, 02-12-19 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to LAB/LHE, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB592 (Same As)
HB412 (Carry Over) 2019-02-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Nakamura excused (2).
HB412 (Carry Over) 2019-02-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Nakamura excused (2).