HI HB411 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB411
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that in a primary election for a legislative seat, the 2 candidates who receive the highest number of votes, regardless of political party, shall be the only two candidates to advance to a general election; provided that when a candidate receives a majority of votes in a primary election, the candidate shall be deemed elected to that seat at the primary election.
Title
Proposing An Amendment To Article Iii, Section 4, Of The Constitution Of The State Of Hawaii To Amend Procedures To Elect Legislators.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-01-25 | House | Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2023-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB411 (Carry Over) 2023-01-25 - Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=411&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB411_.HTM |