HI HB41 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB41
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires all businesses engaged in the sale of goods to include the amount of general excise tax owed in any display or tag indicating the price of the goods. Effective 1/1/2024.
Title
Relating To Price Transparency.
Sponsors
Rep. Sam Kong [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-01-25 | House | Referred to ECD, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2023-01-19 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-12 | House | Prefiled. |
Same As/Similar To
HB41 (Carry Over) 2023-01-25 - Referred to ECD, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=41&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB41_.HTM |