HI HB407 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the deputy director for law enforcement within the department of public safety to be a graduate of a law enforcement academy or a law school; provided that the requirement shall not be applied retroactively to persons appointed prior to July 1, 2009.
Title
Public Safety; Deputy Director
Sponsors
Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Karen Awana [D] | Rep. Faye Hanohano [D] | Rep. Marilyn Lee [D] |
Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] | Rep. Scott Saiki [D] | Rep. Joseph Souki [D] | Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-01-26 | (H) Referred to PBS/LAB, FIN, referral sheet 2 | |
2009-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2009-01-23 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=407&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/HB407_.HTM |