HI HB4 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB4
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Labor & Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Labor & Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a temporary small business income tax credit for qualified employers to offset the cost of providing health care coverage to employees that earn below certain amounts. Raises the minimum wage and establishes an adjusted minimum wage rate for 2027 and after. Repeals the tip credit. Repeals the tax credit on 7/30/2027.
Title
Relating To The Minimum Wage.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to LAT/ECD, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to LAT/ECD, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=4&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB4_.HTM |